Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Sass, Leanne, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Penoyar, William Robin, against Tolefson, Jennifer, in the jurisdiction of Pacific County, WA, . Pacific County, WA Superior Courts with Donald J. Richter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonald J. Richter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 06, 2022 |
CategoryUnd Residential Unlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPacific County, WA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Sheriffs Return on Writ | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Writ of Restitution | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Writ of Restitution | |
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion | |
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Judgment STIPULATED ON WRIT OF RESTITUTION |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order TO LIMIT DISSEMINATION |
|
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Stricken In Court Other Reason | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer and Affirmative Defense | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Richter, Donald J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.