Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Kasma, Todd, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Penoyar, William Robin, against Gordon, Carmen, Juhlin, Ronald, represented by Passannante, Mark G., in the jurisdiction of Pacific County, WA, . Pacific County, WA Superior Courts with Donald J. Richter presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2022 |
CategoryQti Quiet Title |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPacific County, WA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial
Judge: Richter, Donald J |
|
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Striking Trial Date | |
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial
Judge: Richter, Donald J |
|
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order TO CONTINUE TRIAL |
|
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Continue
Judge: Richter, Donald J |
|
April 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order RESERVING ON MOTIONTO EXCLUDE |
|
April 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit NON-SERVICE |
|
April 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONTINUE |
|
April 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Response PLAINTIFF'S TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND AMEND NOTICE OF TRIAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.