Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Boggs, Debra Ann filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Pacific County, WA, . Pacific County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 24, 2022 |
CategoryDvp Domestic Violence |
Last RefreshedAugust 26, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPacific County, WA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Protection Order
Judge: Richter, Donald J |
|
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued Unspecified | |
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Reissuing Temporary Protection Order | |
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Protection Order
Judge: Richter, Donald J |
|
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued Unspecified | |
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Protection Order
Judge: Richter, Donald J |
|
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Reissuing Temporary Protection Order | |
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Temporary Order for Protection | |
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Petition for Order for Protection |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.