Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Taylor, Gail, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Penoyar, Edward Harry, against Deconto, Christina, Weir, Frank, represented by Rayamajhi, Robina, in the jurisdiction of Pacific County, WA, . Pacific County, WA Superior Courts with Donald J. Richter presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2022 |
CategoryUnd Residential Unlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPacific County, WA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Sheriffs Return on Writ | |
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Writ of Restitution | |
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Closed by Court Order After a Hearing | |
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Order | |
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Stricken In Court Other Reason | |
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Agreement STIPULATED |
|
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Order | |
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Show Cause
Judge: Richter, Donald J |
|
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Attorney WAIVER OF FEES |
|
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Stricken In Court Other Reason |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.