Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Garrett, Tyree, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Beauregard, Lincoln Charles, against Naselle Youth Camp, State Of Washington Juvenile Rehabilitation Administration Center, represented by Croft, Allison Margaret, in the jurisdiction of Pacific County, WA, . Pacific County, WA Superior Courts with Donald J. Richter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonald J. Richter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 04, 2021 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPacific County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Set Trial 12 PERSON JURY (5-7 DAYS) Judge: Richter, Donald J |
|
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting PROPOSED |
|
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit OF A. JANAY FERGUSON |
|
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response AND OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTE FOR TRIAL SETTING |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Note for Trial Docket | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Invoice Voucher | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Demand for Jury 12 Person | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability | |
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Record on Change of Venue FROM THURSTON COUNTY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.