Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Germeaux, Nancy, Germeaux, Richard D, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Solan, Stephen John, against Elma Truck & Trailer Inc, Warne, Jane Doe, Warne, Tucker D, represented by Morton, Kathryn Reynolds, in the jurisdiction of Pacific County, WA, . Pacific County, WA Superior Courts with Donald J. Richter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonald J. Richter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 23, 2021 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPacific County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal With Prejudice | |
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Demand for Jury 12 Person | |
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice for Trial Setting | |
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Stricken In Court Other Reason | |
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Set Trial
Judge: Richter, Donald J |
|
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Withdraw | |
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice for Trial Setting | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Statement of Arbitrability | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Response |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.