Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Rahlfs, Roger Edward, against Stallard, Jane Doe, Stallard, Kevin, in the jurisdiction of Pacific County, WA, . Pacific County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2015 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationPacific County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Answer of Garnishee Defendant 16: JDGMT ON ANSWER OF GARN DEF; |
|
June 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 15: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
June 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Application 13: APPLICATION; |
|
June 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of NonMilitary Service 14: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE; |
|
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of NonMilitary Service 12: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE; |
|
February 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 11: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
February 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Exemption Claim 10: EXEMPTION CLAIM; |
|
January 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 9: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); |
|
January 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Application 8: APPLICATION; |
|
December 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment 7: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.