Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cascade Bible Church, filed a(n) Admin Appeals - Administrative case against Endicott Enterprises Llc, Washington State Liquor & Cannabis Board, in the jurisdiction of Okanogan County, WA, . Okanogan County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 08, 2019 |
CategoryAlr Administrative Law Review |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationOkanogan County, WA |
Matter TypeAdmin Appeals |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION Judge: Colbert, Robert R |
|
December 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
December 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal
Judge: Culp, Christopher E |
|
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Email Striking 12/17/19 hearing! |
|
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit TINAYA SMITH |
|
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit KEVIN HEIDERICH |
|
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit OF ERIN MCCOOL |
|
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss ENDIOTT ENTERPRISES, LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION |
|
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
November 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Robert W. Ferguson, Attorney General and Joshua Orf-Rodriguez, Assistant Attorney General |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.