Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Asset Acceptance, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Gordon, Amy Louise, against Hooten, Wini, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Diane M. Price presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 02, 2010 |
CategoryOther Contract Limited (37) - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions327 days |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time327 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Writ (Filed) County of Sonoma |
|
December 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Claim of Exemption 211410-Hearing: Claim of Exemption; Asset Acceptance, LLC vs. Wini Hooten ; Judge: J21196 Price Diane Judge: Price, Diane |
|
December 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order 214210-Order Add'l Description: Claim of Exemption sent to Sheriff 12/8/15 Filed/Issued By: ORDER [214210] Motion: Additional Description : CLAIM OF EXEMPTION SENT TO SHERIFF 12/8/15 Filed By |
|
December 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order 214210-Order Filed/Issued By: 911120 - Defendant Pro Per ORDER [214210] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By DEFENDANT PRO PER [911120] |
|
December 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 213610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [213610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
November 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Opposition or Objections 224210-Opposition/Objections Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff OPPOSITION/OBJECTIONS [224210] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
November 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Claim of Exemption 233620-Claim of Exemption Filed/Issued By: 911120 - Defendant Pro Per CLAIM OF EXEMPTION [233620] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By DEFENDANT PRO PER [911120] |
|
November 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 212920-Notice of Hearing Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff NOTICE OF HEARING [212920] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
September 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs 213710-Memorandum of Costs Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff MEMORANDUM OF COSTS [213710] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
September 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ (Issued) 236110-Writ: Issued Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff WRIT: ISSUED [236110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.