Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Cascade Bible Church, filed a(n) Admin Appeals - Administrative case against Endicott Enterprises. Llc, Washington Liquor, Cannabis Board, in the jurisdiction of Okanogan County, WA, . Okanogan County, WA Superior Courts with Henry A. Rawson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHenry A. Rawson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 26, 2019 |
CategoryAlr Administrative Law Review |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationOkanogan County, WA |
Matter TypeAdmin Appeals |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Mandate | |
November 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Transmittal Letter Copy Filed TO COURT OF APPEALS |
|
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice OF INVOICE TO MR. BRADY |
|
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Designation of Clerks Papers | |
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Statement OF ARRANGEMENTS |
|
October 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Perfection Notice from Court of Appeals | |
September 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Transmittal Letter Copy Filed | |
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Appeal to Court of Appeals |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.