Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
U.S. Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Inj Injunction case represented by Lance, Warren Dean, against Palmer, Eliza, in the jurisdiction of Okanogan County, WA, . Okanogan County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 11, 2018 |
CategoryInj Injunction |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationOkanogan County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
July 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal
Judge: Culp, Christopher E |
|
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL |
|
June 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Return of Service ELIZA PALMER |
|
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing 10: MOTION HEARING; |
|
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order 9: OR GRANTING MT TO PRESERVE PROPERTY; COMMISSIONER DAVID S. EDWARDS; |
|
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
TM Telephonic Motion MT TO PERMIT ENTRY UPON PROPERTY WARREN LANCE 206.596.4870 |
|
May 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 8: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
May 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 7: NOTICE OF HEARING; 05-29-2018TM; MT TO PERMIT ENTRY UPON PROPERTY; WARREN LANCE 206.596.4870; |
|
May 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Findings 6: PROPOSED ORDER/FINDINGS; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.