Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cook, Tess, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Woodiwiss, Christopher, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Michael S. Williams presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 02, 2010 |
CategoryNullity W/O Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions44 days |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time44 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management 941110-Conference: Case Management; Cook, T. vs. Woodiwiss, C. ; Judge: J21196 Price Diane Judge: Price, Diane |
|
July 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Judgment 926110-Judgment Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per JUDGMENT [926110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
July 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Jul 16 2010 Type: 944110 - Judgment/Order Manner : 942110 - After Hearing |
|
July 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice 912910-Notice Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per NOTICE [912910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
July 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
Disclosure 929320-Disclosure Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per DISCLOSURE [929320] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
July 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service 912320-Proof of Service (Petition) Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per PROOF OF SERVICE (PETITION) [912320] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
July 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (Non-DCSS) 931220-OSC Hearing (Initial); Cook, T. vs. Woodiwiss, C. Motion OSC Details: 911290 - Other ; Judge: J21460 Williams Michael Additional Info : Prove Up Judge: Williams, Michael |
|
July 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 913610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [913610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
June 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order: Show Cause 914221-Order: Show Cause (Initial) Motion/OSC Detail: 911290 - Other Add'l Description: Prove Up Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per ORDER: SHOW CAUSE (INITIAL) [914221] Motion: OTHER [911290] Additional Description : PROVE UP Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
June 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Petition 912110-Petition Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per PETITION [912110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.