Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Fawn Lake Maintenance Commision, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Whitehouse, Stephen Talcott, against Lakeview Loan Servicing,Llc, Meier, Ginger, The State Of Washington, Washington State Housing Finance Commission, represented by Evanson, Kymberly Kathryn, Smith, Nathan Frederick Jon, in the jurisdiction of Mason County, WA, . Mason County, WA Superior Courts with Amber L. Finlay presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2022 |
CategoryFor Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMason County, WA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Finlay, Amber L |
|
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion Petition
Judge: Finlay, Amber L |
|
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss | |
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion Petition Lakeview on motion to dismiss Judge: Goodell, Daniel L |
|
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Goodell, Daniel L |
|
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Continue ** CONFIRMED via phone by Christina 3/14/2022 at 1:49pm. -BH Judge: Goodell, Daniel L |
|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Continuance
Judge: Goodell, Daniel L |
|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Goodell, Daniel L |
|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Continue Confirmed tammy with whitehouse & nicholes calledf 2/23/22 @ 3:35 AP Judge: Goodell, Daniel L |
|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing Christina on behalf Nathan Smith confirmed via phone on 2.24.22 Judge: Goodell, Daniel L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.