Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Baker, Stevie, On Behalf Of The Minor Child Rian Greenfield-Wright, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Bonin, John Robert, against Apostle, Alex, Beck, Steven, Goin, Ethan, Goin, James L, Goin, Renee, (total of 11) See All represented by Coker, Christopher John, Sweeney, Kelley J., in the jurisdiction of Mason County, WA, . Mason County, WA Superior Courts with Daniel L. Goodell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel L. Goodell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2020 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMason County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipts of funds into blocked Financial account |
|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Presentation of Final Order confirmed via email from Kim Swendt 10/20/22 at 9:57 AM - SL Judge: Goodell, Daniel L |
|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Approving Settlement
Judge: Goodell, Daniel L |
|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Goodell, Daniel L |
|
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petition FOR APPROVAL OF MINOR SETTLEMENT |
|
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM |
|
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Report of Guardian Ad Litem | |
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem
Judge: Cobb, Monty D |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.