Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Mcdonie, David, filed a(n) Admin Appeals - Administrative case against Washington State Department Of Children, Youth, And Families, Child Protective Services, in the jurisdiction of Mason County, WA, . Mason County, WA Superior Courts with Monty D. Cobb presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMonty D. Cobb Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 07, 2020 |
CategoryAlr Administrative Law Review |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationMason County, WA |
Matter TypeAdmin Appeals |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Closed by Court Order After a Hearing | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal
Judge: Cobb, Monty D |
|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Cobb, Monty D |
|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Hearing CONFIRMED VIA PHONE CALL FROM KRISTEN VALORA (AAT) ON THIS DATE 2/21/23 @ 1:29 PM Judge: Cobb, Monty D |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss | |
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion FOR TRIAL SETTING DATE |
|
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference
Judge: Finlay, Amber L |
|
October 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Setting Status Conference | |
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Status Conference
Judge: Goodell, Daniel L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.