Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Manley, Julie, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Scuderi, Joseph, against Hudson Insurance Bond #10085486, Cobb, Dustin Ray, Joyce, Christine, Epic Painting And Remodeling, Llc, represented by Hansen, William Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Mason County, WA, . Mason County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 04, 2021 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMason County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Disburse Funds BOND PROCEEDS Judge: Cobb, Monty D |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Cobb, Monty D |
|
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reply TO RESPONSE OF LOMA WOODWORKING |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response TO MOTION FOR ALLOCATION AND DISBURSEMENT OF BOND PROCEEDS |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion FOR ALLOCATION AND DISBURSEMENT OF BOND PROCEEDS |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Cobb, Monty D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.