Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Twanoh Falls Beach Club, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Wilson-Hoss, Robert Dryden, against Cornelio Ortiz, Maria G, Molinero Francisco, Omar, Tract 18 Of Twanoh Falls, in the jurisdiction of Mason County, WA, . Mason County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 15, 2019 |
CategoryFor Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMason County, WA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Report STOP PROGRAMS |
|
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Release of lis pendens |
|
April 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Closed by Court Order After a Hearing | |
April 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal
Judge: Goodell, Daniel L |
|
April 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for order of dismissal |
|
April 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Lis Pendens | |
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Information Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.