Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Suttell & Hammer P.S., against Moran, Jade E, in the jurisdiction of Mason County, WA, . Mason County, WA Superior Courts with Amber L. Finlay presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2010 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMason County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; COMMISSIONER RICHARD ADAMSON; |
|
October 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order 18: ORDER RE: JUDICIAL SUBPOENA; |
|
October 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Received -: FILING FEE RECEIVED; -ORDER RE JUDICIAL SUBPOENA TO CRT; ADMIN FOR EXPARTE; |
|
October 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion and Affidavit Declaration 17: MOTION AND AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION; FOR JUDICIAL SUBPOENA; |
|
February 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
MT Civil Motion Calendar SUPPLEMENTAL PROCEEDINGS STRIKE PER SUTTELL 2/6 VAK |
|
February 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Hearing Cancelled Plaintiff Prosecution Requested 16: CANCELLED: PLAINTIFF/PROS REQUESTED; |
|
January 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; COMMISSIONER RICHARD ADAMSON; |
|
January 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order Regarding Supplemental Proceedings 15: ORDER RE: SUPPLEMENTAL PROCEEDINGS; 02-11-2013MT; SUPPLEMENTAL PROCEEDINGS; STRIKE PER SUTTELL 2/6 VAK; |
|
January 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Received -: FILING FEE RECEIVED; |
|
January 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion for Order to Show Cause 14: MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.