Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cach, Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Vos, Ryan Earl, against Lotz, Michael, in the jurisdiction of Mason County, WA, . Mason County, WA Superior Courts with Amber L. Finlay presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2010 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMason County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service -: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
March 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel 11: NOTICE WITHDRAW & SUBSTITUT COUNSEL; |
|
July 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Hearing Cancelled Plaintiff Prosecution Requested 10: CANCELLED: PLAINTIFF/PROS REQUESTED; |
|
July 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
MT Civil Motion Calendar SUPP PROCEEDINGS 1:30 STRICKEN/7-14-11/CASE |
|
June 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Received -: FILING FEE RECEIVED; |
|
June 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; JUDGE AMBER L. FINLAY; |
|
June 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order Regarding Supplemental Proceedings 9: ORDER RE: SUPPLEMENTAL PROCEEDINGS; 07-18-2011MT; SUPP PROCEEDINGS 1:30; STRICKEN/7-14-11/CASE; |
|
June 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Received -: FILING FEE RECEIVED; |
|
June 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion and Affidavit Declaration 8: MOTION AND AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION; FOR SUPP PROCEEDINGS; |
|
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; COMMISSIONER RICHARD ADAMSON; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.