Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Peterson, Harry W, Peterson, Jeanne D, filed a(n) Inj Injunction case against Dickeson, John C, Dickeson, Sandra Lamar, in the jurisdiction of Mason County, WA, . Mason County, WA Superior Courts with Amber L. Finlay presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2007 |
CategoryInj Injunction |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMason County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
OS Order Setting Trial 1ST SET;1/18/11-1/19/11 |
|
January 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; JUDGE AMBER L. FINLAY; |
|
January 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Stipulated 23: ORDER OF DISMISSAL - STIPULATED; |
|
January 05, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial | |
December 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Letter 22: LETTER -CRT ADM TO COUNSEL; |
|
June 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Trial Date -: ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE; 01-17-2011OS; 1ST SET;1/18/11-1/19/11; |
|
June 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Status Conference / Hearing 21: STATUS CONFERENCE / HEARING; |
|
June 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
ST Status Conference STATUS CONF;6-29;8:30 |
|
May 31, 2010 | Docket Event |
ST Status Conference STATUS CONF 6/1/10 @ 8:30 |
|
May 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
Letter 20: LETTER RESCHEDULING STATUS CONF; 06-28-2010ST; STATUS CONF;6-29;8:30; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.