Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ruiz, Jennel, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ruiz, Jesus, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Diane M. Price presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 02, 2010 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions56 days |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time56 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service 912310-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service PROOF OF SERVICE [912310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
November 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice 912910-Notice Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service NOTICE [912910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
October 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management 941110-Conference: Case Management; Ruiz, J. vs. Ruiz, J. ; Judge: J21196 Price Diane Judge: Price, Diane |
|
July 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
Judgment 926110-Judgment Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per JUDGMENT [926110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
July 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Jul 28 2010 Type: 944110 - Judgment/Order Manner : 941110 - Before Hearing |
|
July 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice 912910-Notice Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per NOTICE [912910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
July 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request: Enter Default 929120-Request: Default Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per REQUEST: DEFAULT [929120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
July 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Default 913320-Declaration: Default Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per DECLARATION: DEFAULT [913320] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
July 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Disclosure 929320-Disclosure Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per DISCLOSURE [929320] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
July 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service 912320-Proof of Service (Petition) Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per PROOF OF SERVICE (PETITION) [912320] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.