Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Thompson, Leonard, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case against Dpb Enterprises Inc, U.S. Bancorp, represented by Silverman, Edward Martin, in the jurisdiction of Lincoln County, WA, . Lincoln County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2019 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLincoln County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
June 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
June 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal With Prejudice | |
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT Judge: Barkdull, Jeffrey S |
|
May 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket | |
May 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit in Support OF BRAD E SMITH |
|
May 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss | |
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Withdraw | |
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.