Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Orf, Joyce, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Le, Edward Nguyen Vu Kha, against Sharon Care Center, Inc, represented by Fronapfel, Rhianna Marie, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts with J. Andrew Toynbee presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2022 |
CategoryMed Medical Malpractice |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Toynbee, J. Andrew |
|
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit in Support | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Response | |
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Note for Motion Docket Late Filing Courtesy email to attorney |
|
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Findings | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit re: Motion to Compel |
|
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel | |
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Stricken In Court NonAppearance | |
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel
Judge: Toynbee, J. Andrew |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.