Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Horton, Matthew Rhyan, Sr filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2021 |
CategoryPps Parenting Plan/Child Support |
Last RefreshedJanuary 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Temporary Order
Judge: Mitchell, Tracy L |
|
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Restraining Order
Judge: Mitchell, Tracy L |
|
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order for U/A Judge: Mitchell, Tracy L |
|
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Continuance
Judge: Mitchell, Tracy L |
|
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Restraining Order
Judge: Mitchell, Tracy L |
|
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Mitchell, Tracy L |
|
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Acceptance of Service | |
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Confidential Report in Sealed Envelope | |
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Child Support Worksheet Proposed | |
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Cover Sealed Birth Certificate or Paternity Document |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.