Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Berry, April, filed a(n) Tto Tort - Other case represented by Gustafson, Michael David, against Nike Retail Services, Inc, represented by Van Dessel, Geana Mae, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts with James W. Lawler presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2021 |
CategoryTto Tort - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Lawler, James W |
|
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Arbitration Settlement and Removal from Arbitration Calendar | |
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Assignment for Arbitration Setting | |
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Note for Trial and Statement of Arbitrability | |
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Assignment for Arbitration Setting | |
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Note for Trial and Statement of Arbitrability | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer | |
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Information Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.