Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mccartney, Jacob Mark Murrell filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 07, 2021 |
CategoryDvp Domestic Violence |
Last RefreshedApril 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Compliance Hearing Surrender of Weapons - 4th Hearing Judge: Mitchell, Tracy L |
|
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Court Hearing Minutes | |
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Continuing Hearing Weapon Compliance
Judge: Strophy, Paul |
|
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Compliance Hearing Surrender of Weapons Judge: Strophy, Paul |
|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing Respondent FTA'd Judge: Mitchell, Tracy L |
|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Continuing Hearing Weapon Compliance
Judge: Mitchell, Tracy L |
|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Compliance Hearing Surrender of Weapons Judge: Mitchell, Tracy L |
|
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Sheriffs Return on Service | |
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Compliance Hearing
Judge: Mitchell, Tracy L |
|
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned Unclaimed Email Address was not Valid - DH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.