Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Armed Citizen'S Legal Defense Network, Inc, filed a(n) Admin Appeals - Administrative case against Office Of Insurance Commissioner, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts with James W. Lawler presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 20, 2020 |
CategoryAlr Administrative Law Review |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
Matter TypeAdmin Appeals |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Index | |
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Transmittal Letter Copy Filed Original CRABR to COA |
|
August 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Designation of Clerks Papers | |
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Perfection Notice from Court of Appeals | |
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Motion Petition & Affirming Ins Commissioner ruling |
|
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Letter COA to Atty Freeman |
|
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Transmittal Letter Copy Filed NOA to COA |
|
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Appeal to Court of Appeals | |
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Court Decision to Affirm Appeal Review |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.