Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bradley, Robert Willard filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2019 |
CategoryPps Parenting Plan/Child Support |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Strophy, Paul |
|
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Strophy, Paul |
|
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order on Review Hearing
Judge: Strophy, Paul |
|
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing agreed order entered |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Attorney Fees
Judge: Strophy, Paul |
|
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Attorney Fees
Judge: Strophy, Paul |
|
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion and Affidavit Declaration | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket | |
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Mitchell, Tracy L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.