Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bennett, Brianna Michelle filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts with Tracy Mitchell presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 19, 2019 |
CategoryFju Foreign Judgment - Domestic |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Mitchell, Tracy L |
|
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Strophy, Paul |
|
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Continuance
Judge: Strophy, Paul |
|
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem
Judge: Strophy, Paul |
|
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Mitchell, Tracy L |
|
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Continuance
Judge: Mitchell, Tracy L |
|
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued Stipulated | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.