Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mahan, Holly C, Mahan, Larry V, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Strophy, Paul Anthony, against Daker, Daker & Daker, Llc, Harris, Diane, Harris, Richard, represented by Dugaw, Paul Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts with J. Andrew Toynbee presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJ. Andrew Toynbee Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 26, 2015 |
CategoryQti Quiet Title |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial
Judge: Toynbee, J. Andrew |
|
January 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
January 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice
Judge: O'Rourke, Joely |
|
January 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing -Trial Stricken Judge: O'Rourke, Joely |
|
January 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Addendum To Settlement Stipulation |
|
January 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Settlement
Judge: O'Rourke, Joely |
|
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Release - Partial - Of Lis Pendens |
|
July 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Assignment for Trial Setting | |
July 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Trial Date 2nd |
|
June 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Assignment for Trial Setting |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.