Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Enriquez, Joe, Stay, Lauren, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case against Columbia Regional Asset Investment Group, represented by Petersen, Stephen D, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2016 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice
Judge: Lawler, James W |
|
January 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Motion Petition
Judge: Lawler, James W |
|
January 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
January 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Lawler, James W |
|
January 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit Leonard Kelley |
|
January 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit Joseph Scuderi |
|
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Declaration Affidavit | |
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Response to preliminary injunction |
|
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Hunt, Nelson E |
|
December 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.