Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Procaps Direct Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Walker, Lorna Ann, against Cravea, Darin, Cravea, Eugene Stanley, represented by Mackenzie, Malcolm Alison, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Francisca P. Tisher presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 02, 2010 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited (06) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions463 days |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time463 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction 234110-Satisfaction Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff SATISFACTION [234110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Writ (Filed) 236120-Writ: Filed Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff WRIT: FILED [236120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
April 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order of Examination 213510-Hearing: Order of Exam; Procaps Direct Inc. vs. Cravea, E. ; Judge: J21160 Tisher Francisca P. Judge: Tisher, Francisca P. |
|
April 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Correspondence 212510-Correspondence Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff CORRESPONDENCE [212510] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service 212310-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff PROOF OF SERVICE [212310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
March 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Request 215110-Notification Add'l Description: Abandonment of Appeal Filed/Issued By: NOTIFICATION [215110] Motion: Additional Description : ABANDONMENT OF APPEAL Filed By |
|
March 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Mar 5 2012 Type: 211110 - Abandoned |
|
March 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Abandonment: Appeal 212932-Abandonment of Appeal Filed/Issued By: ABANDONMENT OF APPEAL [212932] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
February 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Transcript: Reporter-Original 293110-Court Reporter's Transcript Filed/Issued By: 6474 - Cynthia Perez-Lomeli |
|
January 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Transcript: Reporter-Original 293110-Court Reporter's Transcript Filed/Issued By: 9079 - Michelle Corrigan |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.