Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Mclellan, Aaron, against Wilmovsky, Gaylend D, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 19, 2015 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
July 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal | |
May 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss 11: MOTION TO DISMISS; |
|
August 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Mailing 10: DECLARATION OF MAILING; |
|
October 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Response 9: RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST; REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCS; |
|
October 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Response 8: RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST; INTERROGATORIES; |
|
September 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing 7: NT OF SERVING REQUEST FOR PROD-; UCTION DIRECTED TO DEF &; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; |
|
September 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing 6: NT OF SERVING 1ST INTERROGATORIES; TO DEF & CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; |
|
September 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Answer 5: ANSWER; |
|
September 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 3: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.