Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Citibank Usa Na, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Suttell & Hammer P.S., against Sanders, Wanda F, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts with Nelson E. Hunt presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNelson E. Hunt Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2009 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) 11: ORDER RE: SUPPLEMENTAL PROCEEDINGS; 02-12-2010; SUPPLEMENTAL PROCEEDINGS; |
|
February 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Hearing Cancelled Plaintiff Prosecution Requested CANCELLED: PLAINTIFF/PROS REQUESTED; 2/12; |
|
February 05, 2010 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT ISSUED TO THURSTON CO; AUDITOR; | |
February 05, 2010 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT ISSUED TO THURSTON COUNTY; SUPERIOR COURT; | |
December 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order Regarding Supplemental Proceedings 11: ORDER RE: SUPPLEMENTAL PROCEEDINGS; 02-12-2010; SUPPLEMENTAL PROCEEDINGS; |
|
December 04, 2009 | Docket Event | FILING FEE RECEIVED SUPPL PROC; | |
December 04, 2009 | Docket Event | FILING FEE RECEIVED EX PARTE; | |
December 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion for Order to Show Cause 10: MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; |
|
October 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order of Default 9: ORDER OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT; JUDGE NELSON E HUNT; |
|
October 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing 8: MOTION HEARING; JUDGE NELSON E HUNT; COURT REPORTER KATHY MAHR; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.