Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Beneficial Washington Inc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Mackie, Jeffrey Scott, against Allen, James E And Marital Community, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts with Nelson E. Hunt presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNelson E. Hunt Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2009 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Release 17: RELEASE OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; TRANSALTA CENTRALIA OPERATIONS; |
|
September 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Stay Regarding Bankruptcy 16: NOTICE OF STAY RE: BANKRUPTCY; |
|
August 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 15: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; TRANSALTA CENTRALIA OPERATIONS; |
|
August 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 14: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT - 2ND; TRANSALTA CENTRALIA OPERATIONS; |
|
July 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 13: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); TRANSALTA CENTRALIA OPERATIONS; |
|
July 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Application 12: APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
June 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 11: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; TRANSALTA CENTRALIA OPERATIONS; |
|
May 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 10: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT - 2ND; TRANSALTA CENTRALIA OPERATIONS; |
|
May 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 9: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); TRANSALTA CENTRALIA OPERATIONS; |
|
May 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Application 8: APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.