Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Washington, filed a(n) Pcc Petition For Civil Commitment case against Schoonover, Richard, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts with Nelson E. Hunt presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNelson E. Hunt Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2009 |
CategoryPcc Petition For Civil Commitment |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Toynbee, J. Andrew |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Presentation of Order LRA Judge: Toynbee, J. Andrew |
|
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion For Entry of Order Granting LRA & Setting Conditions of Release |
|
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel | |
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Other Less Restrictive Alternative |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice re: Authorization to Petition |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order re: LRA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.