Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Capital One Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Suttell & Hammer P.S., against Webster, James C, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts with Richard L. Brosey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard L. Brosey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 28, 2009 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice 16: NOTICE OF DISCHARGE OF DEBTOR; |
|
May 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Release 15: RELEASE OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA; |
|
May 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice 14: NOTICE OF CHAPTER 7 BANKRUPTCY; |
|
April 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Answer of Garnishee Defendant 13: JDGMT ON ANSWER OF GARN DEF; JUDGE RICHARD L BROSEY; |
|
April 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Mailing 10: DECLARATION OF MAILING; |
|
April 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit 11: DCLR IN SUPPORT OF GARN JUDGMENT; |
|
April 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion 12: MOTION FOR JDGMT & ORDER TO PAY; |
|
April 19, 2013 | Docket Event | FILING FEE RECEIVED EX PARTE; | |
March 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 9: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA; |
|
February 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 8: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.