Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
The Grinnell Group Inc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against Bluhm And Associates Land Surveyors Inc, Gill, Chhinder S, Gill, Nash, Gill, Varinder K, Glez Construction Inc A Washington Corporation, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts with Nelson E. Hunt presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNelson E. Hunt Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 25, 2009 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Finality 107: CERTIFICATE OF FINALITY; |
|
September 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Note CASE CURRENTLY STAYED IN C/A; |
|
August 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Withdraw 106: NOTICE OF INTENT TO WITHDRAW; |
|
October 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
Note CASE CURRENTLY STAYED IN C/A; |
|
September 01, 2011 | Docket Event | FILING FEE RECEIVED EX PARTE ADDL; | |
August 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order 105: STIPULATED MOTION & ORDER TO; ABATE CASE FOR SIXTY DAYS; JUDGE NELSON E HUNT; |
|
August 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Note ADDITIONAL 20.00 FORTHCOMING; |
|
August 26, 2011 | Docket Event | FILING FEE RECEIVED EX PARTE; | |
August 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Absence Unavailability 104: NOTICE OF ABSENCE/UNAVAILABILITY; ATTY FOR DEFENDANT: SCUDERI, JOSEPH; |
|
August 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Perfection Notice from Court of Appeals 103: PERFECTION NOTICE FROM CT OF APPLS; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.