Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mclaughlin, Krisann, Mclaughlin, Monte, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Federal Express Corporation, Willis, Roy And Marital Community, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts with Richard L. Brosey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard L. Brosey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 24, 2009 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Stipulated 5: ORDER OF DISMISSAL - STIPULATED; JUDGE RICHARD L BROSEY; |
|
May 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial | |
May 17, 2010 | Docket Event | FILING FEE RECEIVED EX PARTE; | |
December 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 4: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
October 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance 3: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; |
|
September 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Summons 1: SUMMONS; |
|
September 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Complaint 2: COMPLAINT; |
|
September 24, 2009 | Docket Event | FILING FEE RECEIVED; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.