Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Asset Acceptance Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Suttell & Hammer P.S., against Neely, Tara, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts with James W. Lawler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames W. Lawler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 10, 2009 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 18: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; TWINSTAR FCU; |
|
August 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 17: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); TWINSTAR FCU; |
|
August 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit 16: DECLARATION FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
April 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
Trust Received - Garnishment TRUST RCVD-GARNISHMENT; |
|
April 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Answer of Garnishee Defendant 15: JDGMT ON ANSWER OF GARN DEF; JUDGE JAMES LAWLER; |
|
April 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Mailing 12: DECLARATION OF MAILING; |
|
April 06, 2012 | Docket Event | FILING FEE RECEIVED EX PARTE; | |
April 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit 13: DCLR IN SUPPORT OF GARN JUDGMENT; |
|
April 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion 14: MOTION FOR JDGMT & ORDER TO PAY; |
|
February 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 11: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; TWINSTAR FCU; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.