Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Jotblad, James, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Rayan, Todd S, against Barnes, Kenneth, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts with Tracy Mitchell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTracy Mitchell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2009 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Mailing 11: DECLARATION OF MAILING; |
|
February 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order 10: ORDER FOR RELEASE OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
January 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 9: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); |
|
January 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Application 8: APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARN; |
|
December 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance 7: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; |
|
November 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 6: AFF/DCLR/CERT OF SVC-AMENDED; |
|
November 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order of Default 5: ORDER OF DEFAULT & JUDGMENT; AMOUNT CERTAIN; COMM. TRACY LOIACONO MITCHELL; |
|
November 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default 4: MOTION FOR DEFAULT & JUDGMENT; |
|
November 23, 2009 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Default Judgment | |
October 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit 3: DECLARATION OF PROCESS SERVICE OF; SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FOR MONIES DUE; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.