Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Walters, Donald, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mano, Joseph M. Jr, against Chambers, Bethany, represented by Davis, Kazuemon Walter, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts with James W. Lawler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames W. Lawler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2009 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Arbitration Award 12: ARBITRATION AWARD; |
|
October 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Stipulated 11: ORDER OF DISMISSAL - STIPULATED; JUDGE JAMES LAWLER; |
|
October 06, 2010 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial | |
June 16, 2010 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF ARBITRABILITY; | |
April 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Assignments NOTE FOR ARBITRATION |
|
March 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Note for Trial and Statement of Arbitrability 9: NT FOR TRIAL & STMNT OF ARBITRABIL; 04-16-2010A; NOTE FOR ARBITRATION; |
|
November 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Answer 8: ANSWER - DEF; |
|
November 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Request 7: DEF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES &; REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLA; |
|
November 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice 6: NOTICE OF ORAL EXAMINATION OF; DONALD WALTERS; |
|
November 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Letter 5: LETTER TO JOSEPH MANO FROM; KAZUEMON W DAVIS; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.