Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hilton, Carol, Macdonald, Mary R, Heirs & Devisees Of Mary R Macdonald, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case against Jay Lo Corporation A Defunct Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts with Nelson E. Hunt presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 29, 2009 |
CategoryQti Quiet Title |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Judgment 10: JUDGMENT & DECREE QUIETING TITLE; JUDGE NELSON E HUNT; |
|
October 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Default Judgment | |
October 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order of Default 9: ORDER OF DEFAULT; JUDGE NELSON E HUNT; |
|
October 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law 7: FINDINGS OF FACT&CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; |
|
October 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default 8: MOTION & AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT; |
|
October 16, 2009 | Docket Event | FILING FEE RECEIVED EX PARTE; | |
July 31, 2009 | Docket Event |
Lis Pendens 6: LIS PENDENS; |
|
July 31, 2009 | Docket Event |
Summons by Publication 5: SUMMONS BY PUBLICATION; |
|
June 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order for Publication 4: ORDER FOR PUBLICATION; JUDGE RICHARD L BROSEY; |
|
June 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion 2: MOTION FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.