Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Worldwide Asset Purchasing Ii Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Suttell & Hammer P.S., against Whitlinger, Brenda, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts with Richard L. Brosey presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 29, 2009 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) 10: ORDER RE: SUPPLEMENTAL PROCEEDINGS; 02-12-2010; SUPPLEMENTAL PROCEEDINGS; |
|
February 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Hearing Cancelled Plaintiff Prosecution Requested CANCELLED: PLAINTIFF/PROS REQUESTED; 2/12*JRS; |
|
December 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order Regarding Supplemental Proceedings 10: ORDER RE: SUPPLEMENTAL PROCEEDINGS; 02-12-2010; SUPPLEMENTAL PROCEEDINGS; |
|
December 04, 2009 | Docket Event | FILING FEE RECEIVED EX PARTE; | |
December 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion for Order to Show Cause 9: MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; |
|
December 04, 2009 | Docket Event | FILING FEE RECEIVED SUPPL PROC; | |
July 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order of Default 8: ORDER OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT; JUDGE RICHARD L BROSEY; |
|
July 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing 7: MOTION HEARING; JUDGE RICHARD L BROSEY; COURT REPORTER JANE WESTLUND; |
|
July 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motions DEFAULT JUDGMENT **CONFIRMED 7/22 SUTTELL** KKA |
|
July 24, 2009 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Default Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.