Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Citibank South Dakota Na, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Suttell & Hammer P.S., against Westley, Lisa M, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts with Richard L. Brosey presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 24, 2009 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
Release 9: RELEASE OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; SEARS HOLDINGS CORPORATION; |
|
July 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit 7: DECLARATION FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
July 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 8: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); |
|
June 26, 2009 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Default Judgment | |
June 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
Note CERT COPY MAILED/MS; |
|
June 25, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order of Default 6: ORDER OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT; JUDGE RICHARD L BROSEY; |
|
June 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default 5: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT; |
|
June 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 4: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
June 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice Re Dependent of a Person in Military Service 3: NT RE: DEPENDENT OF MILITARY PERSON; |
|
June 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Summons 1: SUMMONS; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.