Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Arrow Financial Services Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Rahlfs, Roger Edward, against Galeana, Jose L And Spouse, Garcia, Miriam And Spouse, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts with Nelson E. Hunt presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 17, 2009 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 18: ANS TO WRIT OF GARN - FINAL; |
|
December 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 17: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT-1ST; |
|
November 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Answer of Garnishee Defendant 16: JDGMT ON ANSWER OF GARN DEF; JUDGE NELSON E HUNT; |
|
November 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
Application 14: APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARN; |
|
November 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 15: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); |
|
November 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 13: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
November 20, 2009 | Docket Event | FILING FEE RECEIVED EX PARTE; | |
November 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
Statement 12: NON-MILITARY STATEMENT; |
|
November 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Re Service Members Civil Relief 11: AFFIDAV/DECL RE: SVC MBR CIV RELIEF; |
|
October 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 10: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT-2ND; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.