Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Citibank South Dakota Na, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Suttell & Hammer P.S., against Denman, Ronald R, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts with James W. Lawler presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 15, 2009 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment 26: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT-FULL; |
|
August 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
Release 25: RELEASE OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; LAKESIDE INDUSTRIES; |
|
August 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 24: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT-2ND; |
|
June 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 23: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
May 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit 21: DECLARATION FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
May 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 22: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); |
|
March 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Answer of Garnishee Defendant 20: JDGMT ON ANSWER OF GARN DEF; JUDGE JAMES LAWLER; |
|
March 11, 2010 | Docket Event | FILING FEE RECEIVED EX PARTE; | |
March 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit 18: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF; GARNISHMENT JUDGMENT; |
|
March 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Mailing 19: DECLARATION OF MAILING; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.