Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bringolf, Kelli S filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts with Richard L. Brosey presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 13, 2009 |
CategoryDvp Domestic Violence |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order 19: ORDER PREASSIGNING TO COURTROOM 4; JUDGE RICHARD L BROSEY; |
|
August 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit 18: DECLARATION OF SHIRLEY COLBERT; |
|
August 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit 17: DECLARATION OF AMBER COLBERT; |
|
May 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit 16: DECLARATION OF HAND DELIVERY; |
|
May 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Motion Petition 15: ORDER DENYING MOTION/PETITION; |
|
May 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing 14: MOTION HEARING; COMM. TRACY LOIACONO MITCHELL; |
|
May 11, 2009 | Docket Event | CD RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS -CD 861; | |
May 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motions PROTECTION ORDER |
|
May 11, 2009 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
May 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit 12: DECLARATION OF SAM COLBERT; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.