Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Dropalski, Sheree, Dropalski, Violet Estate, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case against Mutual Of Enumclaw Insurance Company, Smith, Ethel, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts with Richard L. Brosey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard L. Brosey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2012 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 04, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Stipulated 36: ORDER OF DISMISSAL - STIPULATED; |
|
April 10, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
April 09, 2012 | Docket Event | FILING FEE RECEIVED EX PARTE; | |
February 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
Letter 35: LETTER FROM FREEMAN LAW; |
|
January 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) 33: NOTICE OF TRIAL DATE 01/30-02/03; 01-30-2012; |
|
January 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Letter 34: LETTER FROM FREEMAN LAW STATING; SETTLEMENT OF CASE; |
|
July 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Trial Date 33: NOTICE OF TRIAL DATE 01/30-02/03; 01-30-2012; |
|
July 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Assignments NOTE FOR TRIAL |
|
July 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Note RETURNED JURY DEMAND PER ATTY REQ; |
|
July 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Note HOLDING JURY DEMAND AWAITING FEE/MS; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.