Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Keybank National Association, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Schweet, Laurin Shirley, against Brownings Office Solutions Inc, Sampson, Brad And Marital Community, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts with James W. Lawler presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 07, 2007 |
CategoryAbj Abstract Of Judgment |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Note COPY TO BETH/MS; |
|
April 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order Vacating 15: ORDER VACATING ORDER FOR BENCH; WARRANT FOR CONTEMPT OF COURT; JUDGE JAMES LAWLER; |
|
April 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order 14: ORDER ON CIVIL MOTION RELEASING; FUNDS & EXONERATING BOND; JUDGE JAMES LAWLER; |
|
April 21, 2009 | Docket Event | FILING FEE RECEIVED; | |
April 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion 13: MOTION FOR ORDER VACATING ORDER; FOR BENCH WARRANT, JUDGMENT ON; SUPPLEMENTAL PROCEEDINGS; (FILED MARCH 30, 2007); |
|
April 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion 12: MOTION FOR ORDER RELEASING FUNDS; AND EXONERATING BAIL; |
|
April 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Trust Received - Bond TRUST RCVD-CASH BAIL; |
|
April 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Sheriff Return on a Bench Warrant 11: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON A BENCH WARRANT; |
|
April 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice 10: NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY &; AUTOMATIC STAY; |
|
April 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 9: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.